Case Information: 51425 | |||
Short Caption: | MER PROPERTIES VS. KAY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A495328 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/17/2008 / Mishel, Persi | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Richard McKnight, P.C. check no. 1764. | ||
04/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09236 | |
04/16/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 08-09551 | |
04/17/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. | 08-09669 | |
05/06/2008 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. (FILED PER ORDER 06/06/08). | 08-11251 | |
05/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Leave to File Docketing Statement Lodged on May 5, 2008. | 08-12532 | |
05/23/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/6/08. | 08-13014 | |
06/06/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on May 6, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14308 | |
06/06/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11251 | |
06/06/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 08-14333 | |
06/11/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-14802 | |
06/17/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-15471 | |
06/19/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15775 | |
07/08/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Statement of Non-Intent to Order Transcripts. | 08-17308 | |
09/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 17, 2008. | 08-24293 | |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-26935 | |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants: Opening Brief due: 11/7/08. | 08-27261 | |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-28660 | |
11/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK-AH | 08-29380 | |
11/18/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |