Case Information: 51428 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO GRIEGO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D07374149 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 06/09/2009 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 06/09/2009 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule mailed to all counsel.) | 08-09255 | |
04/28/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10517 | |
04/28/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/5/08 To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 08-10520 | |
05/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Amended Docketing Statement. Due 10 days. | 08-11934 | |
05/27/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Amended. | 08-13235 | |
06/02/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/5/08. | 08-13884 | |
06/02/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/5/08. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 08-13886 | |
07/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 37 Page Appellant's Opening Brief. | 08-18249 | |
08/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion to file a brief in excess of 30 pages is granted. The clerk shall file the 37-page opening brief received on July 16, 2008. Appellant has submitted a 331-page appendix to the opening brief in a single volume. In the interest of judicial efficiency, the clerk shall file the 331-page appendix received on July 16, 2008. | 08-20791 | |
08/12/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-18253 | |
08/12/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-18254 | |
09/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-23706 | |
09/15/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 08-23707 | |
10/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-26731 | |
12/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 08-32477 | |
12/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 9, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) | 09-08623 | |
05/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 09-13035 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP09-MS/NS/MG | ||
10/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-25610 | |
11/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-27690 | |
11/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/25/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 20, 2009. | 09-27690 |