Case Information: 49484 | |||
Short Caption: | GRUTGEN (ROBERT) VS. FOSTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C229132 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/08/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/21/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-11164 | |
06/06/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-12318 | |
08/08/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-17406 | |
08/08/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/15/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-22703 | |
11/09/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-24484 | |
11/09/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2007. | 07-24484 |