judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEFF (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51413
Short Caption:NEFF (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0704024 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/11/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for John Neff, Appellant 08-09082
04/11/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/11/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. 08-09085
05/13/2008TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/18/07, 2/25/08 and 4/7/08. Court Reporter: Kim Manzonie. 08-11966
05/21/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Telephonic Extension. Fast track statement and appendix due: May 28, 2008. 08-12745
05/29/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement 08-13436
05/30/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit in Support of Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Fast Track Statement 08-13637
06/13/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 27, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15068
06/19/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement 08-15674
06/19/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appendix to Fast Track Statement 08-15675
07/10/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Respondent. Deputy Attorney General Michael J. Bongard in lieu of Deputy Attorney General Joseph W. Long. 08-17638
07/10/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response 08-17639
05/07/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of conviction REVERSED." SNP09-JH/RP/KP. 09-11377
06/02/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-12804
06/02/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/10/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. 09-12804