Case Information: 51412 | |||
Short Caption: | HAMPTON VS. HAMPTON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D152828 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/11/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/11/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-09080 | |
04/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-09083 | |
05/02/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. (No service attached.) | 08-11018 | |
05/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Stay Appeal and for Continuance of Further Due Dates. | 08-13102 | |
06/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Appeal and for Continuance of Further Due Dates, and Request for continuance of Fees for Defendant to File in Forma Pauperis. | 08-14874 | |
06/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. | 08-14878 | |
06/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. | 08-14882 | |
07/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Directing Compliance with NRAP 24(a), and Resolving Requests for Extension of Time and to Stay Proceedings. Filing Fee or Compliance with NRAP 24(a) due 30 days. We grant appellant's motion to withdraw his stay motion. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 60 days. Appellant cautioned. | 08-17407 | |
08/26/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-21958 | |
09/02/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing (Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement). | 08-22477 | |
09/19/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Clark County Legal Services stating that Maria Perez Avilez does not work for them. | 08-24336 | |
10/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS. | 08-26163 | |
11/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-26899 | |
11/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/12/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 7, 2008. | 08-26899 | |
11/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Statement of Fact to Append to Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal of Case Due to Filing of Fee Waiver, and Related Relief. | 08-29357 | |
12/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Rehearing. | 08-30630 |