judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERNANDEZ VS. FERNANDEZ

Case Information: 51423
Short Caption:FERNANDEZ VS. FERNANDEZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D230462Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/18/2008 / Gaston, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/14/2009 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:10/14/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Smith Forsberg check no. 7622.
04/14/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-09218
04/18/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston. 08-09684
04/25/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ecker & Kainen check no. 63993.
04/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 08-10342
04/30/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Fernandez. 08-10789
05/06/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/5/08. 08-11236
05/14/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Jennifer Fernandez. 08-12173
05/22/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-12888
05/27/2008TranscriptReceived Transcript. - SEALED- Proceedings: 08/20/07 (Vol. 1), 08/22/07 (Vol. 2), and 08/22/07 (Vol. 3). Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. (FILED PER ORDER 06/04/08). 08-13201
06/04/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the August 20 and 22, 2007, transcripts received on May 27, 2008. The parties are no longer required to include copies of these items in their appendices. 08-14124
06/04/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. - SEALED- Proceedings: 08/20/07 (Vol. 1), 08/22/07 (Vol. 2), and 08/22/07 (Vol. 3). Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 08-13201
06/10/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-14670
06/17/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Receipt of Copy of Transcripts. 08-15458
07/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent/cross-appellant Jennifer Rothman: Robert L. Eisenberg. 08-18988
08/14/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. 08-21001
08/22/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/CR and Respondent/CA 10 days to request transcripts; Appellant/CR 40 days to file and serve fast track statement and appendix. NRAP3E(c)(2). Fn1[3 volumes of transcripts already filed with this court. If no additional transcripts required, appellant and respondent should file a certificate of no transcript request]. Fn3[We disapprove as moot the parties' "Stipulation and Order to Extend Time Period of Filing of appellant's Opening Brief." If parties believe the filing of an "Expanded Fast Track Statement or Response" is warranted, they should file a motion]. See NRAP 3E(d)(3). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-21748
08/27/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 08-22057
09/02/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Redesignating Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. We vacate that portion of our August 22, 2008, order that applied NRAP 3E to this appeal. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 08-22427
09/04/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 08-22742
12/03/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 08-30739
12/03/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 08-30740
01/05/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 4, 2009. 09-00134
01/29/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) 09-02562
01/29/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant 09-02575
01/29/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant 09-02577
02/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Dismissing Cross-Appeal. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees related to the cross-appeal, if any. 09-03921
03/04/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 1, 2009. 09-05464
04/06/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-08657
09/14/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 14, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (SNP09-RP/MD/KP) 09-22279
09/24/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondent. 09-23214
09/29/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-23778
09/30/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. 09-23874
10/14/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP09-RP/MD/KP
02/04/2010Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. Author: Pickering, Kristina. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Douglas. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. SNP09/Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. 10-03076
02/24/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to publishers re: corrections to recently filed opinons. 10-05425
03/02/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-04272
03/02/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. 10-04272