judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

METROPOLITAN LAND DEV. VS. HART

Case Information: 49483
Short Caption:METROPOLITAN LAND DEV. VS. HARTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A515518Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gordon & Silver, Ltd.--check no. 43524.
05/21/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11157
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. 07-12332
06/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 07-13381
06/20/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-13484
06/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-13485
06/26/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-13955
06/29/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-14268
07/20/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 07-15952
07/23/2007Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 07-15952
07/25/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-16312
07/27/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). 07-16592
07/27/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.