Case Information: 51384 | |||
Short Caption: | BEMENDERFER (SAMUEL) VS. DISTRICT COURT (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C235444 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Defendant Bemenderfer's Petition for a Writ of Mandamus Directing the Honorable Jackie Glass to Release to the Defense all Reports and Other Information Regarding the Competency of Defendant Bemenderfer. | 08-08614 | |
04/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Samuel Bemenderfer's Petition for an Emergency Stay of Proceedings Pursuant to NRS 177.145 and NRAP 8(a). | 08-08615 | |
04/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the State, on behalf of the respondent district court, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. Further, we grant petitioner's request for a stay and hereby stay all proceedings below pending our resolution of this writ petition. | 08-10399 | |
06/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Response to Bemenderfer's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-16654 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The State shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. If the State fails to comply with this order, this matter will be decided on the petition and supporting documents on file herein. | 08-17244 | |
07/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file Judge Glass' answer to the petition and the supporting documents, which are attached as Exhibit A to the motion. | 08-17585 | |
07/10/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent Judge Jackie Glass' Answer to Petitioner's Writ of Mandamus. (Per 07/10/08 order, detached from motion 6/30/08 and filed as a separate document.) | 08-17586 | |
07/29/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest- Clark County District Attorney. | 08-19594 | |
06/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "The petition is granted." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn1[Given our resolution of the petition, the stay of the district court proceedings previously entered by this court is lifted.] | 09-13851 | |
06/03/2009 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Howard Brooks for service upon Judge Jackie Glass. | 09-13878 | |
06/17/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Jackie glass on June 11, 2009. | 09-13878 | |
06/30/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-15186 | |
06/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |