Case Information: 49486 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (EDDIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51156 , 51707 , 61009 , 64924 , 66596 , 66596-COA , 72385 , 72385-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219039 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/21/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-11167 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 07-11168 | |
05/25/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 07-11563 | |
05/31/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/27/07. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. | 07-11954 | |
06/04/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from court reporter Liza Lizotte stating that she cannot do the transcript until she receives a deposit. | 07-12203 | |
06/22/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Production of Transcript, to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and Motion to Withdraw. | 07-13744 | |
06/22/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | 07-13745 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Motion for Production of Transcript, to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and Motion to Withdraw.) | 07-14131 | |
07/06/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Withdraw and Suspending Briefing. Yampolsky: 5 days to file motions for transcripts and forma pauperis in district court. Within 5 days of filing those motions, appellant shall notify this court of the district court's decisions. | 07-14793 | |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Due from Yampolsky 20 days. | 07-18042 | |
08/23/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney Mace Yampolsky in response to order (attached district court order filed 7/30/07.) | 07-18749 | |
08/30/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 2/26/07, 2/27/07, 2/28/07, 3/1/07 and 4/19/07. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. | 07-19225 | |
09/06/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Transcript due: 15 days from court reporter Lisa Lizotte. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due 20 days from the filing of the requested transcript. | 07-19638 | |
09/14/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-20349 | |
09/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 14 pages. | 07-20691 | |
09/19/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-20692 | |
09/19/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-20694 | |
09/19/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Motion to Allow Excess Pages, Fast Track Statement, and Appendix. | 07-20695 | |
10/03/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Motion, Fast Track Statement, and Appendix. | 07-21835 | |
10/12/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-22570 | |
10/12/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-22571 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. fn4[We decline to grant Thomas permission to file documents in proper person. This court will take no action and shall not consider the proper person documents Thomas has submitted to this court in this matter.] | 07-26664 | |
01/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00036 | |
01/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/14/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2008. | 08-00036 |