Case Information: 51405 | |||
Short Caption: | ECHT VS. DIST. CT. (TROELL) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A514853 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/11/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/11/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Filed via fax.) | 08-08991 | |
04/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Stay Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(a). (Filed via fax.) | 08-08992 | |
04/11/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Filed via fax.) | 08-08994 | |
04/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Amended Emergency Motion for Stay Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(a). (Filed via fax.) | 08-08995 | |
04/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Temporary Stay. We temporarily stay all proceedings below in District Court Case No. A514853, pending our receipt and consideration of a response to the motion for stay. Real Party in Interest's Response due: 7 days. | 08-09028 | |
04/14/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 4/11/08). | 08-09166 | |
04/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Stay Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(a). (ORIGINAL--filed via fax on 4/11/08). | 08-09168 | |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Harris Schwartz, LLP - check no. 1643. | ||
04/22/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent's Answer to Petition. | 08-10007 | |
04/22/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 08-10009 | |
05/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." SNP08-WM/RP/MD | 08-11492 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-12003 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |