Case Information: 49490 | |||
Short Caption: | VANSOUPHET (KENNY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49031 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C207942 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Cherry | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/21/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-11173 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Michael Cherry sat in district court proceedings. | 07-11174 | |
06/21/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS | 07-13640 | |
07/17/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-13899 | |
07/17/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/24/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 19, 2007. | 07-13899 |