Case Information: 51417 | |||
Short Caption: | HOLMES (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 51072 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51072 *, 51417 | Related Case(s): | 51072 , 54254 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227683 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09151 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which this court is unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. | 08-10780 | |
05/07/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 4/17/08. | 08-11426 | |
04/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn2 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that appellant is only entitled to the relief described herein. This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] NNP09-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 51072/51417. | 09-08901 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-09600 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 8, 2009. | 09-09600 |