Case Information: 51415 | |||
Short Caption: | ODOMS (JOHN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 31533 , 37617 , 39553 , 40151 , 40594 , 42284 , 43495 , 44652 , 44754 , 46049 , 54877 , 55642 , 57374 , 59136 , 63188 , 67949 , 68424 , 71384 , 73089 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C056663 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/19/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09138 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 08-10779 | |
06/19/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 11. | 08-15703 | |
06/19/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn3 [We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-10092 | |
06/05/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-14205 | |
06/30/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-15230 | |
06/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2009. | 09-15230 | |
09/25/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 09-23428 | |
09/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. |