Case Information: 51416 | |||
Short Caption: | STUMP VS. CITY OF HENDERSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51841 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A559181 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Order and to Restore/Maintain Temporary Restraining Order pending Appeal. | 08-09150 | |
04/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Facsimilie. | 08-09152 | |
04/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Prior to Oppositions being required (filed via fax). | 08-09276 | |
04/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal Prior to Oppositions being Required. (Original of fax filed on 4/15/08) | 08-09496 | |
04/16/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Charles LoBello Law Offices--check no. 5434. | ||
04/16/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09509 | |
04/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We conclude that a stay is not warranted in this case. Accordingly, we deny appellants' motion. Fn2 [. . . We thus deny respondents' request to expedite our resolution of their motion to dismiss this appeal, and we defer ruling on that motion pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to it.] | 08-09541 | |
04/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal Prior to Oppositions being Required. | 08-09688 | |
04/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-10052 | |
04/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. City of Henderson's Joinder in Appellees/Intervenors' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Appeal Prior to Oppositions Being Required. | 08-10053 | |
04/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. City of Henderson's Joinder in Appellees/Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal Prior to Opposition s Being Required. | 08-10054 | |
05/06/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-11202 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-12027 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. | 08-12027 |