Case Information: 51407 | |||
Short Caption: | GRINER III (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR060898 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/16/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/11/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/11/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09003 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 08-10778 | |
07/16/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-18318 | |
07/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/16/2008 | Other | Other. Filed Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. (SEALED). | 08-18319 | |
11/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-MG/JH/RP. | 08-28292 | |
12/02/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-28920 | |
12/02/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2008. | 08-28920 |