Case Information: 51399 | |||
Short Caption: | D.R. HORTON, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (COURT AT ALIANTE HOMEOWNERS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49610 , 52751 , 55799 , 57888 , 64145 , 64493 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A527641 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach check no. 089376. | ||
04/09/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 08-08776 | |
04/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 1 of 5. | 08-08779 | |
04/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 2 of 5. | 08-08782 | |
04/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 3 of 5. | 08-08783 | |
04/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 4 of 5. | 08-08784 | |
04/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 5 of 5. | 08-08785 | |
04/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-08968 | |
04/30/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 08-10770 | |
04/30/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Marquis & Aurbach - check no. 89801. | ||
05/30/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13620 | |
06/11/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 08-14804 | |
06/24/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-13722 | |
06/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending. | ||
09/04/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 08-22724 |