Case Information: 51386 | |||
Short Caption: | AYTCH (MARTINEZ) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54832 , 65843 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C230378 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/03/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-08628 | |
04/14/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. To Withdraw as Counsel and Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement and Motion to Extend Time to File Requests for Transcripts. | 08-09142 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant Ms. Rosenblum's and Mr. Segal's motion to withdraw as counsel of record. We remand this appeal for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. District Court order due: 40 days. Appellant's motion for extension of time is granted to the following extent. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9 and NRAP 14 are hereby stayed pending further order of this court | 08-10706 | |
05/09/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. inquiring about appointment of cousnel. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/27/08. | 08-11694 | |
05/20/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/14/08. (Order for Confirmation of Appointment of Counsel. Attorney Karen A. Connolly, Ltd. Is appointed to represent defendant.) | 08-12700 | |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. District Case Minutes-Confirmation of Counsel-K. Connolly. (From Judge Stewart L. Bell). | 08-13137 | |
05/27/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person. The clerk shall return, unfiled any further proper person documents submitted by appellant. Briefing reinstated. Appellant: docketing statement due and transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. Fn1 [Because we elect to address the document on its merits, we direct the clerk to file the proper person document received on May 9, 2008.] | 08-13217 | |
05/27/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. inquiring about appointment of cousnel. | 08-11694 | |
06/10/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Attorney Holly A. Roys of Karen A. Connolly, Ltd. | 08-14733 | |
06/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-15127 | |
06/13/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/16/08, 3/12/08. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. | 08-15128 | |
06/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Docketing Statement due: July 11, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-15321 | |
07/14/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-17960 | |
07/16/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/16/08, 3/12/08. | 08-18320 | |
08/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 24, 2008. | 08-22347 | |
09/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-25113 | |
10/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 11/24/08. | 08-26414 | |
11/26/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-30220 | |
11/26/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-30222 | |
12/31/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-33035 | |
02/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-03262 | |
03/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-05316 | |
03/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-11059 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12749 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4 ,2009. | 09-12749 |