Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Miguel Salas, Appellant | | 08-08623 |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
04/07/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | | 08-08624 |
04/17/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/20/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-09630 |
04/17/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/21/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-09633 |
04/24/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/28/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-10266 |
05/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion Requesting Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues within Page Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure and for Extension of Time. | | 08-12446 |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Directing Full Briefing. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 30 days. | | 08-15065 |
07/09/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 11/20/06, 12/11/06, 1/8/07, 1/16/07, 1/7/08, 2/5/08, 2/11/08 and 3/10/08. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | | 08-17394 |
07/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | | 08-17626 |
07/10/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Approving Stipulation to Extend Time to file Opening Brief. Due Date: August 13, 2008. | | 08-17629 |
07/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcript requested: 2/4/08. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | | 08-18184 |
08/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare Transcripts. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-20654 |
08/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension | | 08-20965 |
08/22/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly A. Ajoub (Receipt of Copies for Appeal Transcripts) stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/4/08, 11/20/06, 12/11/06, 1/8/07, 1/7/08, 2/11/08 and 3/10/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-21671 |
08/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. Ms. Ajoub shall file in this court a certificate acknowledging delivery of the requested transcripts due: 15 days. Appelllant's opening brief due: October 13, 2008. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 08-21798 |
09/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Transcriptionist Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/4/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-22627 |
09/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Transcriptionist Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/20/06, 12/11/06, 1/8/07, 1/7/08, 2/11/08 and 3/10/08. The date of 1/16/07 was also requested, however that date has already been previously transcribed and copies can be obtained from the Clerk's Office. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | | 08-22628 |
10/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-26351 |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 12, 2008. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 08-27279 |
12/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for 21 Day Extension of Time. | | 08-31691 |
12/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2009. | | 08-32602 |
01/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time Due to Missing Portions of Trial Transcript concerning Off the Record Discussions and an Incomplete Appendix. | | 09-00081 |
01/12/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 23, 2009. | | 09-00736 |
01/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (1) Day. | | 09-02113 |
01/27/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 32- Page Opening Brief. | | 09-02287 |
01/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix that were submitted on January 27, 2009, with the motion to exeed page limits. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 09-02498 |
01/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 09-02499 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. IA. (SEALED-contains sealed documents from Vol. 1 and Vol. 7). | | 09-02419 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. I. | | 09-02500 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. II. - Part 1. | | 09-02501 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. II. - Part 2. | | 09-02502 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. III. | | 09-02503 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. IV . | | 09-02504 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. V. | | 09-02505 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. VI. | | 09-02506 |
01/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Appendix Vol. VII. | | 09-02507 |
03/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 09-05240 |
03/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: April 1, 2009. | | 09-05269 |
04/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | | 09-08243 |
04/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until May 1, 2009, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 09-08370 |
05/01/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 09-10923 |
05/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | | 09-12989 |
05/26/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The stipulation to enlarge time to file the reply brief is approved. Due date: July 1, 2009. | | 09-12993 |
07/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-16310 |
07/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Reply brief due July 8, 2009. | | 09-16492 |
07/09/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 09-16849 |
07/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Supplement Appellant's Appendix | | 09-16942 |
07/13/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental to Volume VII - pages 1593-1594. | | 09-17207 |
07/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. no action is required on appellant's motion filed 07/09/09. | | 09-17291 |
01/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel on February 10, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (NNP10-MC/NS/MG) | | 10-00211 |
01/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 10-02149 |
02/01/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Kathleen Hamers. | | 10-02695 |
02/10/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP10-MC/NS/MG | | |
06/23/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for an entry of an amended judgment of conviction consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | | 10-16433 |
07/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (15) days. | | 10-17774 |
07/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: July 25, 2010. | | 10-17917 |
08/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-20138 |
08/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
08/12/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 6, 2010. | | 10-20138 |