Case Information: 55210 | |||
Short Caption: | SONNTAG VS. CONDON, III | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800025 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/04/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-00399 | |
02/17/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-04220 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-08138 | |
05/04/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols 1-3 | 10-11352 | |
05/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/06/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We thus affirm the district court's dismissal of appellant's complaint based on his failure to timely serve respondents." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-20405 | |
09/14/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-23631 | |
10/11/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26558 | |
10/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
10/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 14, 2010. | 10-26558 |