Case Information: 51400 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. YOWELL (ROBERT) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53926 , 63006 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR5147 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-08838 | |
04/17/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/06/07, 2/07/07, and 2/08/07. To Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. | 08-09629 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days. Briefing suspended. | 08-10871 | |
05/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. The State's Answer to Order to Show Cause. | 08-13078 | |
06/12/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-15039 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15480 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 14, 2008. | 08-15480 |