Case Information: 51401 | |||
Short Caption: | KANVICK VS. BD. OF PAROLE COMMR'S | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0700269 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/08/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-08845 | |
05/15/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-12198 | |
05/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve his Notice of Appeal. Appellant's certificate of service on the attorney general due: 30 days. | 08-12935 | |
06/12/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service Upon Order Directing Appellant to Serve His Notice of Appeal. (In response to order dated 5/22/08). | 08-15046 | |
06/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Respondent's Response due: 45 days. | 08-16046 | |
07/21/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-18799 | |
07/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-20514 | |
08/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
10/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn[1We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in this matter as provided in this order.] NNP08C-MC/WM/NS | 08-25414 | |
10/28/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-26246 | |
10/28/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 29, 2008. | 08-26246 | |
11/06/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. Requesting/Filing the court re-submit their decision. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 11/19/08). | 08-28427 | |
11/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Appellant's November 6, 2008, Letter. We will not consider Kanvick's untimely request for rehearing. The clerk of this court shall therefore return, unfiled, Kanvick's November 6, 2008, letter. | 08-29521 | |
11/19/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Proper Person Letter Requesting/Filing the court re-submit their decision. |