Case Information: 51396 | |||
Short Caption: | TANNLUND (PHILLIP) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR075452 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/08/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-08707 | |
04/09/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Brumm stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates were provided. | 08-08833 | |
04/15/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/14/08. Court Reporter: Kathy Brumm. Filed in district court on: 4/3/08. | 08-09352 | |
04/15/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-09354 | |
04/15/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-09355 | |
04/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Due: 20 days. | 08-10048 | |
06/20/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-15796 | |
07/15/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-17901 | |
07/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 16, 2008. | 08-17901 |