Case Information: 51392 | |||
Short Caption: | ORRE (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34558 , 37353 , 37730 , 52296 , 57955 , 60081 , 64245 , 64246 , 72230 , 72230-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158563 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-08695 | |
05/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-11046 | |
05/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-11789 | |
05/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2008. | 08-11789 |