Case Information: 51397 | |||
Short Caption: | MONTELATICI (JEFFERY) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47685 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061024 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/08/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. First Amendment Petition Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-08709 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-10863 | |
05/12/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/1/08. Jeffrey Montelatici. Discharged. No forwarding address. | 08-11737 | |
05/27/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-11757 | |
05/27/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/09/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Notice in Lieu of Remittitur 5/27/08. Jeffrey Montelatici. Discharged. No forwarding address. | 08-14593 |