judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DICICCO VS. DICICCO

Case Information: 51387
Short Caption:DICICCO VS. DICICCOCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 52724 , 58765
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D346232Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/09/2008 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/07/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-08640
04/07/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-08642
04/09/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. 08-08868
04/18/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/28/08. 08-09776
05/05/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-11099
05/06/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Madeline L. Dicicco, Esq. - check no. 1610.
05/09/2008MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Remand. 08-11656
05/11/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
05/14/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Maupin ( Counsel Madeline Dicicco). 08-11699
05/23/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Respondent has filed a motion to remand the case to the district court for further proceedings. 08-13021
07/01/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. . Respondent's motion for remand is denied. Appellant shall have until 7, 2008, to file and serve the docketing statement. 08-16794
07/09/2008Other Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten, not served on settlement judge, and not fastened/bound. 08-17445
08/06/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to File Docketing Statement. Corrected Docketing Statement due: 10 days. 08-20316
08/20/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-21495
08/22/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This appeal should be removed from the program. 08-21707
08/26/2008Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 08-21973
08/29/2008Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. 08-22239
09/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 08-24946
10/08/2008MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Voluntary Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 08-25968
10/28/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). Fn1[In light of this dismissal, the September 26, 2008, notice directing appellant to file a transcript request form is vacated.] CLK- AH. 08-27666
10/28/2008Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.