Case Information: 49481 | |||
Short Caption: | OWENS VS. SANTA BARBARA VILLAGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A514894 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/05/2007 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 01/14/2009 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 01/14/2009 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from R. Christopher Reade, Chtd.--check no. 1685. | ||
05/21/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11130 | |
06/05/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 07-12225 | |
06/08/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-12562 | |
06/14/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-13029 | |
08/13/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 14, 2007. | 07-17800 | |
08/15/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 14, 2007. | 07-17985 | |
10/09/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-22265 | |
10/22/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-23271 | |
11/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Margaret Owens' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File and Complete Request for Transcripts Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 9 and N.R.A.P. 26. | 07-24805 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the transcript request form received on November 14, 2007. | 07-26720 | |
12/10/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/28/07. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | 07-24806 | |
01/23/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-01749 | |
01/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. | 08-01751 | |
02/27/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-04846 | |
03/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-07015 | |
11/24/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 14, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) | 08-29937 | |
12/31/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-32987 | |
01/14/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-10756 | |
05/26/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12198 | |
05/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2009. | 09-12198 |