Case Information: 51430 | |||
Short Caption: | WELLINGTON (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI080590 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/08/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09274 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record. Due: 90 days. | 08-10830 | |
05/08/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-11554 | |
05/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn13-[we deny appellant's motion and documents seeking the appointment of counsel in this appeal.] NNP08-MG/WM/MC | 08-18232 | |
08/12/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19811 | |
08/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/20/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2008. | 08-19811 |