Case Information: 51420 | |||
Short Caption: | GOLD RUSH CASINO VS. DIST. CT. (CHARLIE PALMER HOTELS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A527437 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Heritage Law Firm, LLC--check no. 1151. | ||
04/14/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 08-09180 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 1 of 6 | 08-09181 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 2 of 6 | 08-09182 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 3 of 6 | 08-09184 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 4 of 6 | 08-09185 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 5A of 6 | 08-09186 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 5B of 6 | 08-09187 | |
04/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 6 of 6 | 08-09188 | |
05/29/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to attorney Patrick J. Sheehan returning unfiled the document entitled, "The Charlie Palmer Defendant's Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or in the Alternative, a Writ of Prohibition." | 08-13597 | |
06/18/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Petitioner counsel-Heritage Law Firm, LLC. | 08-15604 | |
07/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-17215 | |
08/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-18667 | |
08/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |