Case Information: 51421 | |||
Short Caption: | EDWARDS VS. DIST. CT. (PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54307 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A551104 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/14/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-09208 | |
04/22/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proper Person Notice. Errata to Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-09975 | |
04/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proper Person Notice. Errata to Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-10625 | |
08/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. fn1[We conclude that petitioner has demonstrated good cause for waiving the filing fee. Accordingly, we grant petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. NRAP 21(e). The clerk of this court shall file the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, provisionally received on April 14, 2008, the errata provisionally received on April 22, 2008, and the errata provisionally received on April 29, 2008.] | 08-20337 | |
08/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Proceed for Filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Forma Pauperis. | 08-09209 | |
08/06/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Errata to Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-09975 | |
08/06/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Errata to Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-10625 | |
08/06/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/08/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Professional Collection Consultants, A/K/A PCC; and Donald K. Hopp, II's Answer to Petitioner Paul D. S. Edwards Writ of Mandamus. | 08-23076 | |
09/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Reply to Professional Collection Consultants, AKA PCC; and Donald K. Hopp, II's Answer to Petitioner Paul D.S. Edwards Writ of Mandamus. | 08-23651 | |
10/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Petitioner's Motion for Leave to file a Reply. We deny the motion. | 08-25533 | |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for the Nevada Supreme Court to Stay Discovery and Vacate all Future Discovery and Trial Dates and Deadlines, in the Above-Entitled Action, Pending Decision by the Nevada Supreme Court on Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-26906 | |
12/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this petition should not be dismissed as moot. Real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, may file any reply within ten days from the date that petitioner's response is served. | 08-31929 | |
12/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-32725 | |
01/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Real Parties in Interest | 09-00642 | |
01/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Real Parties' in Interest Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Strike Reply to Petitioner's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 09-01949 | |
02/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG fn1[We deny petitioner's motion to strike real parties in interest's reply as being untimely by two days.] fn2[We deny as moot petitioner's request for a stay.] | 09-03211 | |
03/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-04581 | |
03/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |