Case Information: 51404 | |||
Short Caption: | NEWMAN VS. RUBIN, M.D. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47488 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0403004 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/16/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/10/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell check no. 12467. | ||
04/10/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-08990 | |
04/16/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 08-09470 | |
04/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-10015 | |
04/24/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Docketing statement due: May 9, 2008. | 08-10234 | |
05/07/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11392 | |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. Potential jurisdictional defect and not appropriate for settlement process. | 08-12444 | |
06/26/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16323 | |
07/01/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-16733 | |
07/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent's (Rubin M.D.) Request that Appellant Comply with NRAP 9 Regarding Reporter's Transcripts. | 08-17162 | |
07/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Response to Request that Appellant Comply with NRAP 9 Regarding Reporter's Transcripts. | 08-18497 | |
07/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. as it appears that Rubin has been provided with the desired transcripts, his request is denied as moot. If Rubin desires the production of any other transcripts, he shall notify appellant, in writing, within ten days from the date of this order. See NRAP 9(a)(2). Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental transcript request form if any additional transcripts are requested by Rubin. | 08-18663 | |
09/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-23925 | |
09/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-4. | 08-23926 | |
10/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Joint Motions on Behalf of Resopndents Steven Rubin and Page Newman to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction, to Strike Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motions. | 08-26602 | |
10/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion in Part. Briefing in this appeal is hereby stayed pending further order of this court. We defer ruling on respondents' motion to dismiss and motion to strike. | 08-27000 | |
10/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Joint Motion. | 08-27163 | |
05/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal in Part and Denying Motion to Strike. Briefing Reinstated. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | 09-11613 | |
06/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 10, 2009. | 09-14306 | |
06/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (Respondent Newman). | 09-16033 | |
07/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Steven E. Rubin, M.D.'s Answering Brief. | 09-17215 | |
07/13/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent Steven E. Rubin, M.D.'s Appendix. | 09-17216 | |
07/15/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief and Motion for Extension of Time Within Which To Do So. | 09-17370 | |
07/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. | 09-17609 | |
07/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to file a Joint Reply Brief and Extension of Time to file Reply Brief. Appellant may file a single reply brief, due: August 21, 2009. | 09-17853 | |
08/21/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-20411 | |
12/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-30202 | |
01/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-00003 | |
01/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2010. | 10-00003 |