judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEV. RESORT ASS'N VS. NEV. STATE EDUC. ASS'N (BALLOT QUESTION)

Case Information: 51411
Short Caption:NEV. RESORT ASS'N VS. NEV. STATE EDUC. ASS'N (BALLOT QUESTION)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 08OC000661BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/11/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, P.C.--check no. 39479.
04/11/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Nevada Resort Association. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-09027
04/11/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison & Howard--check no. 082070.
04/11/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Las Vegas Sands, LLC. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-09030
04/11/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. 08-09076
04/11/2008MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal (Immediate Consideration Requested). Filed via fax. 08-09086
04/14/2008MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. (Original). 08-09147
04/14/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Las Vegas Sands' Joinder in Nevada Resort Association's Emergency Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. 08-09173
04/14/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Emergency Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal - Emergency Counter-Motion for Consolidation of Appeals and Revision of Briefing Schedule. Nos. 51411/51168. 08-09177
04/16/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting, in Part, Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Setting Oral Argument. We defer ruling on respondents' request that we consolidate this appeal with the appeal in Docket No. 51168, pending our receipt and consideration of appellants' response to our April 14, 2008 show cause order, and any reply thereto. We determine that an expedited briefing schedule is warranted. Appellants Opening Brief and Appendix due: Monday, May 12, 2008. Respondents Answering Brief due: Monday, June 2, 2008. Appellants shall then have until Monday, June 9, 2008, to file and serve any reply. Service of documents shall be personal or by facsimile transmission. No extensions of time to the briefing schedule will be granted. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule this matter for oral argument before the full court on Tuesday, July 1, 2008. Once scheduled, the parties will be notified with the exact time for the argument. fn2[We suspend the provisions of NRAP 25(1)(a), which provide that a document is timely filed if, on or before its due date, it is mailed to this court or dispatched for delivery within three calendar days by a third party commercial carrier or deposited in the Supreme Court drop box. All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. Appellants shall, within seven days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or certificate indicating that no transcript is to be requested.] 08-09396
04/18/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Firm Name and Address. Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, P.C. is now known as Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP. 08-09677
04/21/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant Las Vegas Sands. Transcripts requested: 04/01/08. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. 08-09912
04/23/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Las Vegas Sands. 08-10067
04/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Expediting Preparation and Filing of the Transcript. Sunshine Court Reporting Services certiticate of delivery due: 10 days. fn2[We deny respondents' request, in a motion that it filed on April 14, 2008, to consolidate this appeal with the appeal in Docket No. 51168, since the parties have filed a stipulation requesting that this court dismiss that appeal.] 08-10121
04/23/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julietta Forbes stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/01/08. 08-10150
04/23/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Sunshine Court Reporting Services regarding the order filed 04/23/08. 08-10160
04/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. -Disclosure of Non-Disqualifying Interest. Sandra Gibbons, the spouse of Justice Gibbons, holds an indirect interest in matters relating to the Golden Gate Casino, LLC. Any party objecting to Justice Gibbons' participation should notify the clerk of this court in writing before 5 pm on Monday, May 12, 2008. 08-10213
04/24/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant Nevada Resort Association. 08-10220
04/28/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Response to Notice of Modification of Caption. 08-10514
05/01/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Nevada Resort Association. 08-10890
05/02/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 08-10981
05/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Modifying Caption. The clerk shall remove Ross Miller as a respondent to this appeal. If any party objects to the modification of the caption, he shall so inform this court, in writing, within 10 days. 08-11394
05/12/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Las Vegas Sands. 08-11817
05/12/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 08-11820
05/13/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant Nevada Resort Association. (filed via fax). 08-11866
05/15/2008MotionFiled Motion. Objection to Order Modifying Caption. 08-12226
05/15/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nevada Resort Association. (Original). 08-12277
05/21/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The parties shall have five days from the date of this order to inform this court of this matter's status and to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as moot. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-12775
05/27/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on July 1, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. (En Banc) 08-13233
05/27/2008MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 08-13281
06/16/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2-[We vacate the oral argument scheduled on July 1, 2008, at 1:30 p.m.] [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] EN BANC-MG/WM/JH/RP/MD/MC/NS 08-15233
07/11/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-15418
07/11/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 14, 2008. 08-15418