judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KING VS. MILLER

Case Information: 49535
Short Caption:KING VS. MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55936 , 63431 , 65042 , 67139
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D349825Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2007 / Gaston, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/29/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Albright Stoddard Warnick & Albright--check no. 19291.
05/29/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-11726
06/13/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston. 07-12908
06/15/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-13139
06/15/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-13140
06/27/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-14063
06/29/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-14269
07/09/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 10, 2007. 07-14887
07/13/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-15239
07/26/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-16413
08/06/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/19/06 and 07/20/06. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 07-17210
08/08/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/19/06 & 7/20/06. Court Reporters Andrew Voight & Stephen Clarkson (submitted by Albright, Stoddard firm). 07-17493
08/09/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 07-17641
08/22/2007MotionFiled Motion. for Remand. 07-18631
10/01/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt Certification and Re: Transcripts. Appellant: 30 days to file report. Briefing in this matter is stayed pending further order of this court. In the event that briefing is reinstated, appellant shall include copies of the requested transcripts in the appendix of the opening brief. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 07-21632
10/03/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-21792
10/10/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. of October 3, 2007 as Moot. Fn1 [A copy of this court's October 1, 1007, order is attached to this order.] 07-22409
11/02/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Report on Remand Status. 07-24080
11/28/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Remand Status. Report or Stip to Dismiss due: 1/9/08. Briefing remains stayed. 07-25650
01/11/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Report of Remand Status. 08-00790
02/06/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Smith Forsberg--check no. 7427.
02/06/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 08-02926
02/08/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant 08-03228
02/08/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/10/07. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 08-03239
03/17/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/10/07. Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 08-06621
03/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall file a report with this court regarding the status of the district court proceedings within 30 days from the date of this order. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Tedd Anthony Miller's response due: 15 days. 08-06855
03/25/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copies of Transcripts delivered to Smith Forsberg. (12/10/07) 08-07362
04/07/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause Filed March 20, 2008. 08-08616
04/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Report on Remand Status. 08-10072
05/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Dismissing Cross-Appeal. The clerk shall modify the caption to reflect the dismissal of Tedd Anthony Miller's cross-appeal. Briefing is reinstated. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. Alternatively, if a settlement is reached, appellant shall file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal within 90 days from the date of this order. 08-12143
08/13/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-20910
08/13/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-20911
09/22/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant 08-24399
09/22/2008MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for an Order Clarifying the Remand Status of Action; Motion to Stay Briefing or Extend Time for Filing of Respondent's Brief, or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 08-24434
10/10/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-26117
10/10/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 08-26118
11/06/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-28411
11/19/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[Respondent's "Motion to Stay Briefing or Extend Time of Filing of Respondent's Brief," and appellant's "Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief" are denied as moot.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-29456
12/08/2008Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 08-31236
12/08/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. 08-31237
12/15/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright. Check no. 23385
02/05/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Appellant's petition for rehearing is denied." 09-03193
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04637
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2009. 09-04637
04/19/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/15/10, 3/29/10. 10-10165