Case Information: 49569 | |||
Short Caption: | BRAUNSTEIN (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36948 , 37685 , 37760 , 40667 , 40678 , 40873 , 40958 , 40967 , 41725 , 43404 , 45863 , 49565 , 69312 , 69512 , 70392 , 70392-COA , 70434 , 73170 , 73170-COA , 75038 , 75038-COA , 76788 , 76788-COA , 77331 , 78128 , 79894 , 79894-COA , 80184 , 80184-COA , 80251 , 81481 , 82230 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158840 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12265 | |
07/05/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. | 07-14592 | |
07/31/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-15589 | |
07/31/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 3, 2007. | 07-15589 |