Case Information: 53432 | |||
Short Caption: | NEVADA MOTEL PARTNERS, LLC VS. MANN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0301812A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/23/2009 / Yott, Laurie | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from William F. Heckman, Ltd. check no. 1444. | ||
03/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-06848 | |
03/23/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott | 09-07214 | |
03/31/2009 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Not typewritten. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. | 09-08148 | |
04/01/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-08152 | |
04/16/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/26/09 | 09-09596 | |
05/28/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Settlement Agreement requires remand to district court. | 09-13297 | |
05/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 09-13298 | |
06/18/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. and Remanding to the District court. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing "We dismiss this appeal." This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellants may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-15283 | |
06/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |