judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONTOGNESE VS. STATE

Case Information: 34614
Short Caption:MONTOGNESE VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P0868Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice AgostiPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07137
08/05/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Fast track notice erroneously mailed to all counsel on 8/3/99 -- this is not a fast track appeal (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
08/13/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. May 27, 1999 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Judith Schonlau. 99-07538
08/16/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-07573
08/24/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. May 27, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 99-07900
12/01/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 11/20/99. 99-11984
12/01/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-11985
01/03/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/30/99. 00-00057
01/24/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 1/20/00. 00-01098
01/24/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment and order of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn10[The Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] NNP01A-WM/MS/RR 01-09766
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10321
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10321