judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CINTHYA AZUCENA PAGUAGA, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend v. ESTATE OF JOSE NOEL PAGUAGA CASCO, JR., deceased, et al.

Case Heading (S-07-0003)
Case Number:S-07-0003Case Docketed On:01/04/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:CINTHYA AZUCENA PAGUAGA, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend v. ESTATE OF JOSE NOEL PAGUAGA CASCO, JR., deceased, et al.
Full Title:CINTHYA AZUCENA PAGUAGA, a minor child, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, her grandmother and next friend, and GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, individually; and SARAHY BRINGAS, JACKELYN PAGUAGA, and NOELIA SARAHY PAGUAGA, by and through GLORIA VALEE TOLEDO, their next friend and Guardian, Administrator, Conservator of the estates, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ESTATE OF JOSE NOEL PAGUAGA CASCO, JR., deceased; CENTRAL REFRIGERATED SERVICE, INC., a Utah corporation; JOHN C. NASH, JR., an individual; C.R. ENGLAND, a Utah Corporation; RAJA SARVENTHIRAN, an individual with Canadian Citizenship; 1398076 ONTARIO INC., a Canadian corporation, d/b/a SBS TRUCKING; TADEUSZ ZNOJEWSKI, an individual; FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC., a Delaware corporation; MARIAN PODGORNI, an individual; WEST WIND EXPRESS, INC., an Illinois corporation; MARTEN TRANSPORT, LTD., a Delaware corporation; and) DONALD STEVENS, an individual, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCynthya Azucena PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppellantGloria Valee ToledoTony S. Lopez
AppellantSarahy BringasTony S. Lopez
AppellantJackelyn PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppellantNoelia Sarahy PaguagaTony S. Lopez
AppelleeJose Noel Casco Jr.
AppelleeCentral Refrigerated Service, Inc.Rebecca A. Lewis
AppelleeJohn C. Nash Jr.Paul Kapp
AppelleeC. R. EnglandPaul Kapp
AppelleeRaja SarventhiranJeffrey C. Brinkerhoff
Appellee1398076 Ontario Inc.Jeffrey C. Brinkerhoff
AppelleeTadeusz ZnojewskiThomas A. Nicholas III
Richard Grant Schneebeck
Robert Carl Jarosh
AppelleeFedex Ground Package System, Inc.Thomas A. Nicholas III
Richard Grant Schneebeck
Robert Carl Jarosh
AppelleeMarian PodgorniRonald E. Triggs
AppelleeWest Wind Express, Inc.Ronald E. Triggs
AppelleeMarten Transport, Ltd.G.G. Greg Greenlee
Heather Anne Zadina
AppelleeDonald Stevens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/04/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/04/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/04/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
01/09/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/09/2007Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
01/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Certification of Defendants Marten Transport, Inc., Donald R. Stevens, West Wind Express, Inc., and Marian Podgorni of compliance with W.R.A.P. 1.01Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/30/2007Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
02/07/2007Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant's office regarding sanction. Secretary said she will get it out today.EventPhone CallFinal
02/09/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal