judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

URBAN INVESTMENTS INC. BRANHAM, LILLIAN

Case Information: 79-CV-0816
Short Caption:URBAN INVESTMENTS INC. BRANHAM, LILLIANClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4820-78Filed Date:07/27/1979

Opening Event Date:07/27/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/11/1979Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/14/1980
Argued/Submitted:04/08/1980
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901URBAN INVESTMENTS INC. t/a A-1 REALTY ET AL BRANHAM, LILLIAN
07/27/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/11/1979FiledRecord Completed
01/14/1980FiledBriefing Completed
04/08/1980FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/05/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/17/1988LETTER TO APPEALS COORDINATOR & ATTYS RE: RETURN OF EXHIBITS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD