Case Information: 49571 | |||
Short Caption: | BOND (BENTON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061943 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-12271 | |
06/12/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/27/07. Court Reporter: L. Rosenthal. Filed in district court on: June 8, 2007. | 07-12885 | |
06/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. | 07-13079 | |
06/18/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: April 27, 2007. Court Reporter: Leslie R. Rosenthal. | 07-13228 | |
07/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 07-14545 | |
07/26/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-16475 | |
08/21/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-16574 | |
08/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/28/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2007. | 07-16574 |