Case Information: 49570 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (TYRONE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C218574 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-12269 | |
06/08/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 07-12594 | |
06/12/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. | 07-12876 | |
06/25/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/15/06, 01/03/07, 01/08/07, 02/21/07, 02/27/07, 02/28/07, 04/18/07, and 05/14/07. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Sonia Riley-Bennett. Filed in district court on: 06/19/07. | 07-13849 | |
06/29/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 02/21/07, 02/27/07, 02/28/07, 04/18/07 and 05/14/07. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. | 07-14272 | |
07/16/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-15421 | |
07/16/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 11/15/06, 01/03/07 and 01/08/07. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | 07-15434 | |
07/19/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 07-15816 | |
08/03/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-17090 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. | 07-17479 | |
08/21/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 15 pages. | 07-18489 | |
08/21/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-18490 | |
08/21/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-18492 | |
09/12/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 18 Page Fast Track Response. | 07-20200 | |
09/12/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Response. | 07-20202 | |
09/17/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response provisionally submitted on September 12, 2007. | 07-20494 | |
09/17/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-20202 | |
05/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-11478 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-12074 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. | 08-12074 |