Case Information: 49572 | |||
Short Caption: | YOUNG (JOSEPH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070578 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-12275 | |
07/18/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 23, 2007. | 07-15611 | |
07/24/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16179 | |
07/24/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-16180 | |
08/01/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-16920 | |
10/16/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-22838 | |
11/13/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-24598 | |
11/13/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/03/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 15, 2007. | 07-24598 |