judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ATC/VANCOM VS. MACDONALD

Case Information: 49579
Short Caption:ATC/VANCOM VS. MACDONALDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55915
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A485373Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2007 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/17/2008 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV
Submission Date:10/17/2008How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Greenberg Traurig, LLP--check no. 2879.
06/06/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-12355
06/13/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. 07-12896
06/18/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-13245
06/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-13332
06/20/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13443
06/22/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Staetment served on Settlement Judge. 07-13722
07/23/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 15, 2007. 07-16020
08/21/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-18433
09/12/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 07-20169
09/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause and to provide this court with a file stamped copy of a district court order. 07-20722
09/27/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 07-21412
09/28/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 07-21515
10/03/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/12/07 and 02/22/07. To Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 07-21830
10/03/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 07-21831
10/10/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/27/07, 02/28/07, 03/01/07, 03/05/07, 03/06/07, 03/07/07, and 03/08/07. To Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley. 07-22375
10/10/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 07-22376
10/11/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Requests for Transcripts filed on 10/03/07 and 10/10/07. 07-22526
10/11/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Receipt of copy of Transcripts. 07-22528
10/15/2007TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Thelma Stapley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/12/07. 07-22790
10/17/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Thelma Stapley in response to requested transcripts. 07-22930
10/22/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed. The parties shall comply with the briefing schedule established in this court's order entered on 9/12/07. 07-23191
11/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcripts listed in Ms. Stapley's letter and certificate. Appellant shall include copies of the transcripts in the appendix to the opening brief, and Ms. Stapley is not obligated to file copies of the transcripts in this court. 07-25330
12/14/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 10, 2008. 07-27219
01/14/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-00925
01/14/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 9. 08-00926
01/31/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 13, 2008. 08-02503
03/11/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-06042
03/25/2008MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Answering Brief. 08-07230
03/31/2008Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the 31-page answering brief received on March 25, 2008. 08-07868
03/31/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-07232
04/28/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. 08-10574
08/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 17, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. (SNP08-JH/RP/MD) 08-21954
10/02/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 08-25443
10/16/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from David Kihara of the Las Vegas Review-Journal requesting permission to have a photographer in the courtroom. Nos. 49087/49246/49579. Filed via fax. 08-26706
10/16/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the aforesaid matter, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. David Kihara of the Las Vegas Review-Journal is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. 08-26732
10/16/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Faxed notice from Miriam Firestone, KVBC Channel 3, requesting media coverage of oral argument. Nos. 49087, 49446, 49579 (not consolidated). 08-26773
10/16/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. permission is granted for video media coverage of the aforesaid matters, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. Miriam Firestone of the KVBC-TYl is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. Nos. 49087, 49246, 49579. 08-26777
10/17/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP08-JH/RP/MD
02/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "AFFIRM the judgment of liability, REVERSE the judgment of damages on the jury verdict, and REMAND for separate trials on the issues of past and future damages in a manner that is consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 09-03220
03/03/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-04588
03/03/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/16/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 2009. 09-04588