Case Information: 49558 | |||
Short Caption: | HOLMES (VICTOR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40412 , 41484 , 50379 , 52003 , 52589 , 53688 , 54214 , 67362 , 67362-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C184507 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/01/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12116 | |
06/29/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. Fn2 [We have considered all documents submitted by appellant in this matter, and we conclude no relief is warranted.] | 07-14345 | |
07/24/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-15417 | |
07/24/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/03/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 30, 2007. | 07-15417 |