Case Information: 49557 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITE (ALLEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41087 , 47817 , 47964 , 48581 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C179835 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/13/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/01/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/01/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12114 | |
06/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-13230 | |
08/13/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-17873 | |
08/13/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/24/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Supplemental ROA due: 40 days. | 07-20948 | |
10/11/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/4/06, 12/6/06 and 3/12/07. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. (in response to 9/24/07 order-submitted by county clerk) | 07-22509 | |
11/08/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 07-24475 | |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26059 | |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/19/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 6, 2007. | 07-26059 |