Case Information: 49574 | |||
Short Caption: | NUNO-VELASCO (JUAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47358 , 61302 , 68695 , 68695-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR022297 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/21/2008 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12277 | |
06/05/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/18/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. | 07-13222 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on August 7, 2007, appointing Thomas L. Qualls, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 07-17409 | |
08/08/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 07-17410 | |
08/16/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 7, 2007 appointing Thomas L. Qualls, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 07-18133 | |
08/24/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/1/02, 11/13/02, 12/20/02, 1/28/04, 2/4/04, 3/11/05, 9/7/05, 9/14/05, 1/12/06, 2/17/06, 3/24/06, 4/26/06, 5/5/06, 5/10/06, 7/20/06, 9/21/06, 12/7/06, 1/9/07, 3/6/07 and 5/1/07. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 07-18800 | |
08/24/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-18801 | |
12/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 7, 2008. | 07-26624 | |
12/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. counsel is admonished for his failure to identify and serve the proper court reporters. Ms. Davidson, Ms. Vohl, and Ms. Dotson shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, prepare, file and serve copies of the December 20, 2002, January 12, 2006, and May 1, 2007, transcripts. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, the appropriate court reporter shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. | 07-28040 | |
12/28/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 01/12/06. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. | 07-28238 | |
01/04/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 12/20/02. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. (In response to order filed 12/26/07.) | 08-00337 | |
01/07/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 05/01/07. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. | 08-00354 | |
01/09/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-00572 | |
01/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 08-00574 | |
01/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-02420 | |
02/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-05061 | |
03/04/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/1/07. | 08-05446 | |
03/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-06975 | |
03/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. For Thomas L. Qualls, Esq. | 08-07295 | |
05/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-12358 | |
06/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13100 | |
06/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/23/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 2008. | 08-13100 |