Case Information: 49568 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48647 , 49985 , 56201 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224890 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/05/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
06/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-12264 | |
06/26/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-WM/RP/JH. | 07-13993 | |
07/24/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-14217 | |
07/24/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/03/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 30, 2007. | 07-14217 |