judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FIGUEROA VS. SOUTHWEST RANCH HOMEOWNERS C/W 49415

Case Information: 49577
Short Caption:FIGUEROA VS. SOUTHWEST RANCH HOMEOWNERS C/W 49415Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 49415 *, 49577Related Case(s): 49415
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A528965Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2007 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bell and Young, Ltd.--check no. 109063.
06/06/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-12333
06/12/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12789
06/13/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. 07-12891
06/20/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13440
06/25/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 28, 2007. Nos. 49415/49577-cases are not consolidated. 07-13815
07/16/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 49415/49577-cases are not consolidated. 07-15383
12/11/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants: 15 days from the date of this order to request transcripts. 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Nos. 49415/49577 (07-26906).
12/26/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/15/07 and 4/19/07. To Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. Nos. 49415/49577. [07-27923]
02/13/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Richard Kangas to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 49415/49577 (08-03527).
02/26/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Patricia Slattery stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/15/07 and 4/19/07. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-04651)
03/11/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-06074)
03/11/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-06075)
04/11/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-09048).
05/07/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 49415/49577. (08-11405).
09/08/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment challenged in Docket No. 49415 AFFIRMED and VACATE the May 10, 2007, order challenged in Docket No. 49577." We therefore direct the district court to vacate the May 10, 2007, order granting rehearing and affirming its prior order. SNP08-JH/RP/MD Nos. 49415/49577. 08-23041
10/03/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-23289
10/03/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/13/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2008. 08-23289