judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEIMER, JR. VS. MCELFRESH

Case Information: 55257
Short Caption:STEIMER, JR. VS. MCELFRESHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A510919 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/19/2010 / Bongiovi, JosephSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/14/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-01203
01/14/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/19/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Christensen 10-01405
01/19/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Prince & Keating check no. 33577.
02/03/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-02984
02/03/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. 10-02986
02/09/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-03620
02/11/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 10-03819
02/22/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Suspend the Mandatory NRAP 16 Settlement Program with a Stipulation to Enter into Private Mediation. 10-04674
02/24/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. Appellant's counsel informed the settlement judge's office that the parties were going to stipulate to handling this matter through a private mediator. 10-04911
03/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We approve the parties' stipulation to submit this matter to private mediation with Joseph J. Bongiovi, in lieu of formal assignment to the settlement program. The parties shall fully comply with the procedural, reporting and time requirements of NRAP 16. Status Report due: 6/30/10 10-05622
06/14/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. An offer is pending and is being considered. 10-15402
07/09/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-17786
08/09/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Case Number 55257, with Prejudice. 10-20498
08/11/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 10-20734
08/11/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.