judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTINGLY (DANA) VS. STATE C/W 31154

Case Information: 31541
Short Caption:MATTINGLY (DANA) VS. STATE C/W 31154Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 31154 *, 31541Related Case(s): 31154
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C89386Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/15/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/15/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
12/24/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person (returned 1 copy).
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 31154, 31541. Document No. 00-16143.
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16529
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16529