judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER KURTENBACH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0289)
Case Number:S-07-0289Case Docketed On:12/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER KURTENBACH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER KURTENBACH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Christopher KurtenbachDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Brian J. Hunter
Laura J. Derry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2008 WY 109
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/31/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Brian Hunter and Laura Derry for appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/14/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and approvalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Laura J. Derry for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric Johnson, Director, PAP, Laura J. Derry, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Derry for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/06/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/06/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/7/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Mandate reissued to the District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal