Case Information: 10-CM-1165 | |||
Short Caption: | CALVIN D. BATES V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related |
Lead: | 10-CM-1165 | Consolidated: | 10-CM-1166 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CMD7993-10 | Filed Date: | 09/14/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/14/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 11/03/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | Y |
Briefs Completed: | 05/26/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/18/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/14/2012 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | Calvin D. Bates | Y |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/14/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/28/2010 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CM-1165 and 10-CM-1166 for all purposes herein. Itis FURTHER ORDERED that Jeffrey Light, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript avaiable for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC) | |||
09/28/2010 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Jeffrey Light, Esquire | |||
10/06/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)) | |||
11/03/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (135pgs/Tape) 8/9/10 proc. | |||
11/03/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8pgs/Tape) 9/10/10 proc. w/CD included | |||
11/03/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD INDEX (10CM1166) | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD COPIES (10CM1166) | |||
11/04/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/8/10; request for revocation/ removal from PSA supervision filed 7/1/10) *******SEALED | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD INDEX (10CM1165) | |||
11/04/2010 | RECORD COPIES (10CM1165) | |||
11/04/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/8/10; request for revocation/ removal from PSA supervision filed 7/1/1/0) ******SEALED | |||
11/09/2010 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |||
12/16/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/14/11 no oppo | |||
12/28/2010 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 14, 2011. (JAC) | |||
02/14/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached | |||
02/14/2011 | APPENDIX | |||
03/17/2011 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 20, 2011 (no oppo) | |||
03/30/2011 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 28, 2011. (By: JAC) | |||
04/28/2011 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo). | |||
05/12/2011 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC) | |||
05/26/2011 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/26/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
06/09/2011 | Filed | Final Screening - Summary | ||
09/01/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/12/2011 | Filed | Motion for Oral Argument (Appellant) | ||
10/07/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Aplt's request for oral argument. | ||
10/18/2011 | Filed | Argued BeforeFisher,Reid,Farrell Jeffrey L.Light Esq.,for appellant Sharon A.Sprague Esq.,for appellee | ||
10/28/2011 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, retired, and Farrell, Senior Judge.) | ||
11/07/2011 | Filed | Petition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) | ||
02/02/2012 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc | ||
02/14/2012 | Filed | Mandate |